MD HB604 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which firefighters, fire fighting instructors, rescue squad members, advanced life support unit members, and members of the Office of the State Fire Marshal are presumed to be suffering from an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty and is compensable under the workers' compensation law to encompass individuals with at least 10 years of cumulative service within the State and the cancer or leukemia has resulted in partial or total disability or death; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ Compensation – Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer – Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough’s Cancer Protection Law)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-4) (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HousePassed Enrolled
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (131-4)
2019-03-27HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
2019-03-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {467773/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (131-3)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {863698/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0604&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0604f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0604t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0604e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0604_86369801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0604_46777301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0604_64312901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0604.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0604_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0585.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0604_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0747.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0962.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback