MD HB604 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the Act applies only to an action against a certain manufacturer of lead pigment for certain damages allegedly caused by the presence of lead-based paint in a residential building located in Baltimore City; providing that the Act does not apply to certain actions for certain damages arising from personal injury or death, to certain actions against a person other than a manufacturer, or to certain actions brought by a person other than the City of Baltimore, the Housing Authority of Baltimore City, or a certain owner; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Lead Remediation and Recovery Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Damages
Environment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Industry and Technology
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Damages
Environment
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Housing
Industry and Technology