MD HB604 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of regular members and eliminating substitute members on the Charles County Board of Elections; requiring the members of the board to be of specified political parties; requiring that a vacancy on the board be filled in a certain manner; and making the Act effective June 6, 2011.
Title
Charles County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Ways and Means |