MD HB604 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to use up to 400 gallons of greywater per day for household gardening, composting, lawn watering, or landscape irrigation under specified circumstances; defining the term "greywater" to mean used, untreated water generated by the use of and collected from a clothes washing machine, shower, bathtub, or lavatory sink; etc.
Title
Environment - Greywater - Residential Use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0604.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0604f.pdf |