MD HB601 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a carrier from rejecting a provider who provides community-based health services for an accredited program because the provider practices within the scope of the provider's license and is a registered psychology associate; and altering the reason for which a carrier is prohibited from rejecting a certain provider for participation on the carrier's provider panel.
Title
Health Insurance – Provider Panels – Providers of Community–Based Health Services
Sponsors
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] |
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 271 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {217670/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Community Facilities and Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Medical Treatments
Psychologists
Community Facilities and Services
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Medical Treatments
Psychologists