MD HB601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a drug classified as an opioid to be dispensed with a nontoxic composition designed to permanently and chemically sequester or deactivate the drug and be used for disposal of the drug; and establishing that a certain provision of the Act does not relieve a person from certain requirements of law regarding controlled dangerous substances.
Title
Public Health - Opioids - Dispensing Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |