MD HB600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 270
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a dealer in Baltimore County to sell, barter, deliver, give away, show, or offer for sale a motorcycle or certificate of title for a motorcycle on Sunday.
Title
Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Del. Pat Young [D] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Catherine Forbes [D] | Del. Michele Guyton [D] |
Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Carl Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 270 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-01-29 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB1021 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-13 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Baltimore County
Blue Laws
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Titles
Blue Laws
Business Regulation and Occupations
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Titles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 18 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |