MD HB600 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Power Plant Research Program to study and make recommendations regarding nuclear energy and its role as a renewable energy resource in the State; and requiring the Program to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020, its recommendations regarding initiatives for the State and the General Assembly to responsibly and efficiently grow the nuclear industry in the State, support for emerging nuclear energy technologies, and utilization of nuclear energy to combat climate change.
Title
Study on the Future of Nuclear Energy in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-34) (Y: 103 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-34) |
2019-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-21 | House | Floor Amendment {653624/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Special Order until 03/21 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Special Order until 03/20 (Delegate Stewart) Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {683493/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuclear Matters
Pollution
Power Plants
Reports
Sunset
Utility Regulation
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources, Department of
Nuclear Matters
Pollution
Power Plants
Reports
Sunset
Utility Regulation