MD HB600 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a provision of law to authorize, rather than require, a court to hold a hearing on a petition for expungement if the State's Attorney files a timely objection to the petition; and authorizing a court to deny a petition for expungement without a hearing if the court finds that the petition is barred as a matter of law; authorizing a specified petitioner to request a hearing within 30 days under specified circumstances; requiring the court to hold a hearing under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without Hearing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |