MD HB600 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an ordinance enacted by St. Mary's County regarding property maintenance to provide for a voluntary agreement between the county and an owner of real property for remediation by the county of specified conditions constituting a nuisance, including demolition of specified improvements; providing that unpaid costs under the voluntary agreement may be enforced by the filing of a lien against the property until repaid; requiring St. Mary's County to record notice of the lien in the land records of the county; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440 |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {470712/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Notices
Nuisances
Real Property
Recordation
St. Mary's County
Counties - Local Laws
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Notices
Nuisances
Real Property
Recordation
St. Mary's County