MD HB600 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-20 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified judgment obtained in favor of a Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipient to be increased by a specified amount under specified circumstances; authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to collect from a Program recipient the full amount of specified payments in specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsors
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
Del. Veronica Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {496281/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Debt Collection
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Judgments
Medical Assistance
Patients
Public Health
Torts
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Judgments
Medical Assistance
Patients
Public Health
Torts