MD HB60 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to be the Maryland Department of Labor; renaming the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to be the Secretary of Labor; providing that the Maryland Department of Labor is the successor of the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing that certain names and titles of a certain unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 91
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-27SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-02-21HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-21HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-14HouseSpecial Order until 02/21 (Delegate D. E. Davis) Adopted
2019-02-14HouseFavorable
2019-02-14HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-21HouseHearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback