MD HB6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-16 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person who is charged with the care of a child under the age of 3 years from allowing the child to be locked or confined in a dwelling, a building, an enclosure, or a motor vehicle out of the sight of the person charged unless the person charged with care provides a reliable person at least 15 years old to remain with the child to protect the child; provides a penalty not to exceed $500 or imprisonment not to exceed 30 days, or both, for violations of the Act; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of 3 Years
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-11-20 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Child Care
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Family Law
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Family Law
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences