MD HB6 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Special Order until later today (Senator Shank) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-05 - Special Order until later today (Senator Shank) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Including as an allowable expenditure of funds from a campaign account under the State election law a disbursement to pay for travel, lodging, meals, and registration expenses associated with attendance of an office holder or a candidate at meetings or conferences focused on legislative issues, process, or public policy analyses pertinent to the office the elected official holds or that the candidate seeks.
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Special Order until later today (Senator Shank) Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments 254635/1 | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-08-26 | Pre-filed |