MD HB598 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Health from conditioning reimbursement of applied behavior analysis services provided to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients on the presence or availability of the parent or caregiver of the Program recipient in the setting where the applied behavior analysis services are provided to the Program recipient; providing that a certain provision of the Act does not prohibit the Department from establishing reasonable standards for the involvement of a parent or caregiver; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {756487/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB469 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 772
Subjects
Caregivers
Communications
Examinations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Communications
Examinations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 149 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |