MD HB598 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that employees of the Injured Workers' Insurance Fund are not subject to specified laws, regulations, or executive orders governing State employee compensation; and repealing a requirement that the Board for the Fund set compensation for its employees in accordance with the State pay plan.
Title
Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Employee Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-17 | Re-assigned Economic Matters & Appropriations | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation