MD HB596 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing certain requirements for certain player brand agreements between certain professional athletes and certain investors; establishing that player brand agreements that comply with requirements of the Act are valid, binding, and enforceable contracts notwithstanding certain laws; providing that the Attorney General and the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General have certain authority to enforce the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law - Professional Athlete Funding Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-29HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-20HouseHearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB512 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law111701(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law111702(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law111703(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law111704(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law111705(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law111706(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback