MD HB596 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the age of eligibility from under 3 years to under 18 years of age to participate in the Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program in the State Department of Education.
Title
State Department of Education - Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program - Age of Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Education, State Department of
Equipment
Hearing Aids
Loans
Minors
Physicians
Primary and Secondary Education
Education, State Department of
Equipment
Hearing Aids
Loans
Minors
Physicians
Primary and Secondary Education