MD HB596 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a wholesale distributor to notify a pharmacy at least 30 days before the wholesale distributor imposes a limit on the quantity of a prescription drug or prescription device distributed to the pharmacy; requiring a wholesale distributor, while a limit is in effect, to provide a pharmacy with an update, at least weekly, on the quantity of a prescription drug or prescription device available to the pharmacy; and establishing the circumstances in which a notification and an update are not required.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Wholesale Distributors - Notification to Pharmacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-1) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {126484/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |