MD HB596 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an electric or gas distribution utility, on written request of a specified competitive supplier, to provide specified information about customer accounts to the supplier, subject to specified restrictions; requiring the distribution utility to provide the information in a specified form and to update it periodically; authorizing a customer to refuse authorization to share specified information; requiring a distribution utility to notify a specified supplier when specified authorization is withdrawn; etc.
Title
Electric Companies and Gas Companies - Customer Account Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Notices
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Records
Utilities
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Notices
Privacy
Public Service Commission
Records
Utilities