MD HB595 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the requirement that a mortgage or deed of trust bear a specified certification that the instrument was prepared by a specified person in order to be recorded; providing that a deed other than a mortgage, deed of trust, or an assignment or release of a mortgage or deed of trust may not be recorded unless the instrument bears specified certification of preparation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520
2017-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2017-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {960819/4 Report Adopted
2017-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0595?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0595f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0595t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_520_hb0595t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0595_96081904.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0595.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0595_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0595_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0595,h-0523&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0595,s-1326&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback