MD HB595 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that no person may require, as a condition of a sale or transfer of owner-occupied residential property to a certified community development financial institution, any affidavit, statement, agreement, or addendum that limits ownership or occupancy of the property by the immediately preceding mortgagor or grantor under specified circumstances; exempting a certified community development financial institution from specified homeowners in foreclosure protection laws; and making the Act an emergency measure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233
2014-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2014-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-19SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
2014-03-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
2014-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2014-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {540610/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2014-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-13HouseHearing cancelled
2014-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-30HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0595?ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0595f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0595t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_233_hb0595t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0595_54061001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0595.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0595_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0595_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0595,h-0323&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0595,s-1180&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback