MD HB594 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring specified research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take specified steps to provide for the adoption of a dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing specified research facilities to enter into specified agreements with animal rescue organizations for specified purposes; and requiring specified research facilities to submit specified information to the Secretary of Agriculture beginning on December 1, 2017, and each year thereafter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-7) (Y: 128 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (128-7)
2016-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {206987/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2016-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-19HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2016-02-16HouseHearing cancelled
2016-02-17HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-03HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback