MD HB593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the student loan tax credit that allows certain individuals with certain student loan debt amounts to claim a credit against the State income tax to include graduate student loan debt.
Title
Income Tax - Student Loan Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {123929/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (11-35) (Y: 12 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {123929/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (11-35) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {405667/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |