MD HB592 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Queen Anne's County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county property tax imposed on real property owned by the foster parent of a child; authorizing the governing body of Queen Anne's County to provide, by law, for eligibility criteria for the credit, the amount and duration of the credit, specified regulations and procedures, and any other provision necessary to carry out the credit; etc.
Title
Queen Anne's County - Property Tax Credit - Foster Parent
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading Ways and Means |