MD HB591 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain law enforcement agencies, on or before July 1, 2025, to require the use of body-worn cameras by certain law enforcement officers, subject to certain policies.
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB556 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0591?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0591f.pdf |