MD HB591 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB224
Note: Carry Foward to future SB434
Note: Carry Over of previous HB708
Note: Carry Foward to future SB434
Note: Carry Over of previous HB708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding eligibility for a property tax exemption for the dwelling house of a disabled veteran to include veterans with a service connected disability of at least 80%; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021.
Title
Property Tax Exemption – Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB591 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
HB591 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB258 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
HB708 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
HB591 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
SB258 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
HB708 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0591?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0591f.pdf |