MD HB591 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters relating to the local economic impact of opening new credit unions or banks within a 1-mile radius of bank deserts in the State and within a 1-mile radius of Coppin State University campus; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-45) (Y: 95 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-45) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983099/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset