MD HB591 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Anne Arundel County a BWLT beer, wine and liquor tasting (on-premises) license; specifying that the BWLT license and BWT licenses may be issued to specified persons; creating a license fee schedule for a BWLT license and altering the fee schedule for a BWT beer and wine (on-premises) tasting license; and specifying limitations on the amount of alcoholic beverages that may be offered for on-premises consumption.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {883496/1 Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {623996/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Fees
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Anne Arundel County
Fees