MD HB59 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act; authorizing an individual to transfer specified property to one or more beneficiaries effective at the transferor's death by a transfer-on-death deed; establishing that a transfer-on-death deed is revocable and nontestamentary; providing that the capacity required to make or revoke a transfer-on-death deed is the same as that required to make a will; etc.
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-07-23 | House | Pre-filed |