MD HB589 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the source of funding for certain required appropriations; altering the area in which certain raffle proceeds are required to be used; expanding the authorized uses of certain funds; establishing the Maternal and Child Health Population Health Improvement Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the budget bill submitted at the 2022 General Assembly session a certain appropriation; altering the amount of a required appropriation from the Transportation Trust Fund for the operation of the Maryland Transit Administration; etc.
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Committee Amendment (#34) Adopted (Y: 82 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Committee Amendment (#34) Adopted (Y: 82 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150 |
2021-04-02 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Report {963524/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-12) |
2021-04-02 | House | Conference Committee Report {963524/1 Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate advisors: (Senators Rosapepe, Young and Elfreth) |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Edwards, McCray, Zucker and Griffith) |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate Refuses Recede |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate advisors: (Senators Rosapepe, Young and Elfreth) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Edwards, McCray, Zucker and Griffith) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Refuses Recede |
2021-03-26 | Senate | House advisors: (Delegates Korman and B. Barnes) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates McIntosh, Chang, Beitzel, Haynes and Reznik) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-03-26 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | House advisors: (Delegates Korman and B. Barnes) |
2021-03-26 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates McIntosh, Chang, Beitzel, Haynes and Reznik) |
2021-03-26 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2021-03-26 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243724/1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243724/1 Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243724/1 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Motion to suspend Rule 52 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-19) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#35-38) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#34) Adopted (82-51) |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#31-33) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#31-38) |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#24-30) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#16-23) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#10-15) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Amendment (#1-9) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {323425/1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {323425/1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB493 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Annapolis
Appropriations
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Attorney General
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Cannabis
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Country Clubs
COVID-19
Damages
Education
Education, Boards of
Fish and Fishing
Forests and Parks
Grants
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Natural Resources, Department of
Operating Budget
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Property Tax
Public Broadcasting Commission
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Raffles
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
State Bonds
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Veterans
Appropriations
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Attorney General
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Cannabis
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Counties
Country Clubs
COVID-19
Damages
Education
Education, Boards of
Fish and Fishing
Forests and Parks
Grants
Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Natural Resources, Department of
Operating Budget
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Property Tax
Public Broadcasting Commission
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Raffles
Reports
Retirement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
State Bonds
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 13 | 1911.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 612.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 625 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 14 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 31 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 31 | 107.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 6 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 329 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 13 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |