MD HB586 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, by December 1, 2015, the Department of Juvenile Services to prepare and submit to the General Assembly a specified assessment of the feasibility of repealing specified provisions of law relating to offenses excluded from the jurisdiction of the juvenile court.
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded Offenses
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. Marice Morales [D] |
Sen. William Smith [D] | Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-4) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Assessments
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Reports
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Reports