MD HB585 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing a life-threatening injury to another as a result of the person's driving, operating, or controlling a motor vehicle or vessel in a criminally negligent manner; exempting specified conduct that results in a life-threatening injury to another; establishing penalties, and a specified exemption, for a first violation of the Act which constitute a misdemeanor subject to imprisonment of up to 18 months or a maximum fine of $5,000 or both; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Brett Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {422115/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Motor Vehicle Operation
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Transportation - Generally
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Motor Vehicle Operation
Negligence
Penalties and Sentences
Transportation - Generally
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road