MD HB584 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-14)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to make available the investigational drug, biological product, or device to eligible patients; requiring a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to notify a specified patient and a specified health care provider of specified side effects or risks; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to develop an informed consent form that meets specified requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 771
2017-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2017-04-10HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {967271/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2017-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {146788/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-03HouseHearing canceled
2017-02-10HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0584?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0584f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0584t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0584e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_771_hb0584e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0584_14678801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0584_96727101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0584.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0584_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0584_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0584,h-0823&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0584,s-1220&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0584,h-1419&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback