MD HB583 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maternal Mortality Review Program, in consultation with the Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities, to make recommendations to reduce disparities in the maternal mortality rate including recommendations related to social determinants of health; requiring the Secretary of Health to include in the annual report regarding the Maternal Mortality Review Program a section on racial disparities that compares mortality rates, the number of live births by race and a comparison of leading causes of death by race; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Maternal Mortality Review Program – Recommendations and Reporting Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {296882/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback