MD HB582 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a pharmacy to stock at least one generically equivalent drug or order the generically equivalent drug for delivery to the pharmacy within a reasonable period of time, under specified circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacies - Availability of Generically Equivalent Drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2017-02-09HouseHearing canceled
2017-02-10HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback