MD HB582 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the age at which a normal service retirement allowance begins for a member of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who is a maximum security attendant at the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital Center; altering the age at which a vested allowance begins for specified members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who serve as maximum security attendants at the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital Center; and applying the Act only prospectively to an individual who retires on or after July 1, 2016; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2016-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2016-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {529335/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2016-03-24SenateHearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m.
2016-03-22SenateHearing cancelled
2016-03-24SenateHearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m.
2016-03-02SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2016-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2016-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {404260/1 Report Adopted
2016-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2016-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-03HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0582?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0582f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0582t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0582e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0582_40426001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0582_52933501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0582.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0582_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0582_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0582,h-0185&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0582,s-1020&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0582,h-1158&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback