MD HB582 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a licensed tree expert to provide specified notice to the Department of Natural Resources of the status of any company that engages in the business or work of the treatment, care, or removal of trees under the tree expert's license and of the liability and property damage insurance and workers' compensation insurance carried by each company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed Tree Experts - Notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 101
2014-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2014-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-25SenateHearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2014-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {940815/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2014-02-12HouseHearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
2014-01-29HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0582?ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0582f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0582t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_101_hb0582t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0582_94081501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0582.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0582_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0582_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0582,h-0594&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0582,s-1009&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback