MD HB582 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing vehicles of public service companies to be equipped with or display yellow or amber lights or signal devices; and making conforming and stylistic changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Vehicles of Public Service Companies - Use of Yellow and Amber

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-02 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2012-03-19 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2012-03-18 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2012-03-17 Second Reading Passed
2012-03-17 Favorable Report Adopted
2012-03-20 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2012-02-08 Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-06 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback