MD HB582 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to notify specified county officials and, if applicable, a specified municipal corporation, of specified information when the Board issues a specified Class C beer, wine and liquor license; and requiring a specified administrative official to notify specified county officials and, if applicable, a specified municipal corporation, when a use and occupancy zoning permit is issued that allows entertainment in the county to be held for specified organizations or the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Issuance of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses and Park

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-04 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed (45-0)
2010-04-03 Special Order 4/9 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
2010-04-02 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-02 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-06 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-26 Hearing 4/2 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-19 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-04 Returned Passed
2010-03-18 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2010-03-16 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-16 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-15 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-03 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback