MD HB581 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from a specified reemployment earnings limitation specified disability retirees whose average final compensation was less than $25,000 and who are reemployed while receiving an ordinary disability retirement allowance from the State Retirement and Pension System.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 9:00 a.m. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 8:30 a.m. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {974061/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Disabilities
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Work, Labor and Employment