MD HB577 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to adopt certain regulations, on or before October 1, 2021, relating to housing, accommodations, safety, health, rights, and welfare of H-2A and H-2B visa and migrant workers during the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Health and Welfare of H–2 Visa and Migrant Workers – COVID–19 Pandemic – Regulations (Healthy Farmworkers Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Chemical Tests
Clinics
COVID-19
Diseases
Equipment
Eviction
Farmland
Federal Government
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Immigrants and Citizenship
Inspections
Labor, Department of
Language
Medical Treatments
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Protective Equipment
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Chemical Tests
Clinics
COVID-19
Diseases
Equipment
Eviction
Farmland
Federal Government
Health
Health, Department of
Housing
Immigrants and Citizenship
Inspections
Labor, Department of
Language
Medical Treatments
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Occupational Safety
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Protective Equipment
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment