MD HB575 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a declaration of a condominium to provide for the suspension of the use of certain common elements by a unit owner that is more than 60 days in arrears in the payment of any assessment due; requiring a declaration containing a certain suspension provision to state that a suspension of the use of common elements may not be implemented until the council of unit owners provides certain notice and holds a hearing; etc.
Title
Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common Elements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {760618/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |