MD HB573 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of Baltimore County to waive any interest or penalties imposed on a person for late payment of the county property tax on residential real property in Baltimore County for tax years beginning after June 30, 2021, but ending before July 1, 2023; and terminating the Act on December 31, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County – Overdue Property Taxes – Waiver of Interest and Penalties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property14603(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property14702(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback