MD HB572 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB40
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1147
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that single-occupancy public restrooms be marked with gender-inclusive signage that does not indicate a specific gender, contains certain descriptive language and contains a picture or icon that does not indicate a specific gender, in certain places of public accommodation and certain public buildings; providing that a county is responsible for enforcing the signage requirement in places of public accommodation; and authorizing a county to set certain fines for second and subsequent violations after a certain period of time.
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-04-11 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB572 (Carry Over) 2022-04-11 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
SB486 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
HB1147 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
SB486 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
HB1147 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Counties
Counties - Generally
Fines
Food
Gender
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Municipalities
Public Buildings and Facilities
Restaurants
restrooms
Signs and Billboards
Stadiums
Theaters
Counties
Counties - Generally
Fines
Food
Gender
Hotels and Motels
Human Relations
Municipalities
Public Buildings and Facilities
Restaurants
restrooms
Signs and Billboards
Stadiums
Theaters
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 20 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |