MD HB572 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 45-29)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from $750 to $1,500 the maximum allowable amount of a credit against the State income tax that provides $5 for each bushel of oyster shells recycled during a taxable year; extending the termination date of the credit to June 30, 2021; and providing for the application of certain provisions of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension

Sponsors

Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. Christopher Adams [R]Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Carl Anderton [R]Del. Steven Arentz [R]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Susan Aumann [R]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]
Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. Ned Carey [D]Del. Mary Carozza [R]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R]Del. Jerry Clark [R]Del. John Cluster [R]
Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Paul Corderman [R]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]
Del. Mark Fisher [R]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]Del. William Folden [R]Del. Barbara Frush [D]
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Robin Grammer [R]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]
Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Susan Krebs [R]
Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Bob Long [R]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Susan McComas [R]Del. Tony McConkey [R]
Del. Mike Mckay [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]Del. Warren Miller [R]
Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Charles Otto [R]
Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Sid Saab [R]
Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]
Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]Del. David Vogt [R]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Recede
2018-04-05SenateCommittee Amendment {349732/1 Withdrawn
2018-04-05SenateMotion Recede (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
2018-04-05HouseDelegates Walker, Buckel, and Ebersole
2018-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {349732/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {365168/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback