MD HB572 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-24)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 3/29 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 3/29 at 9:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Retirement Benefits for Public Officials; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the possible forfeiture or suspension of retirement benefits for public officials when charged with or convicted of a criminal act; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2012; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Retirement Benefits for Public Officials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 9:00 a.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments 484262/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Officials
Reports
Retirement Systems
Sunset
Crimes and Punishments
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Officials
Reports
Retirement Systems
Sunset