MD HB571 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund to include money received by the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General from a final settlement, an agreement, or a judgment relating to an investigation or enforcement of the Maryland Consumer Protection Act for an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice for rental residential property, excluding restitution and the costs of the action the Attorney General is entitled to recover.
Title
Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20 |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-37) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {263829/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB279 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Subjects
Attorney General
Attorneys
Consumer Protection
Eviction
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Attorneys
Consumer Protection
Eviction
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |