MD HB570 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the determination of the amount of the standard deduction for an individual under the Maryland income tax; altering the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain taxable years by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration and Cost-of-Living Adjustments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {489330/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {495365/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-14HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0570&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0570f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0570t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0570e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0570_49536501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0570_48933001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0570.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0570_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0547.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0570_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1217.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1328.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback