MD HB568 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Information Technology and county boards of education, to develop and update certain best practices for certain county boards on data governance policies and procedures and for certain professional development; requiring the State Department of Education to develop certain strategies to coordinate and assist certain data governance staff to implement certain practices; defining certain terms; etc.
Title
Education - Student Data Governance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {825065/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Contracts
Counties
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
General Assembly
Identification
Information Technology, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counties
Data
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
General Assembly
Identification
Information Technology, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology